FRIENDS OF WENDELL PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cake stalls, after school clubs and activities, fairs, various fund raising events to raise money for school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 08 June 2005: Standard registration
- WENDELL PARK PRIMARY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henrietta Dale | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olena O'Leary | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvie Glossop | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carla Stanke | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Castell | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlette Saunders | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Blijdenstein | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABIGAIL SPURWAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.80k | £10.21k | £6.37k | £6.34k | £8.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.45k | £1.29k | £12.37k | £4.74k | £8.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 September 2023 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 12TH APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wendell Park School
Cobbold Road
London
W12 9LB
- Phone:
- 07787147833
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window