SOCIAL INFORMATION ON DISABILITY (SID) LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of advice, guidance and support and promotion of equality of opportunity for disabled people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £94,164 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Kent
- Oxfordshire
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 03 August 2005: Standard registration
- 11 October 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 11 October 2016: Funds transferred to 1036450 AGE UK SURREY
- SID (Working name)
- DISABILITY INFORMATION SERVICES (DISS) LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £346.68k | £354.50k | £311.68k | £245.19k | £101.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £305.88k | £333.53k | £298.48k | £279.27k | £185.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £94.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 14 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 14 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 04 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 04 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 10 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 10 October 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 APRIL 2005 AND 12 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT AND THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY FOR DISABLED PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. SURREY, KENT, EAST SUSSEX, WEST SUSSEX AND HAMPSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window