WORD INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage and promote worship of God. Provide Christian and value education to married couples, young adults, youth and children. Provision of grants for charity and ministerial work among indigent children, (feeding & education). Study grant for theological education of pastors and leaders. Conduct Youth Camps and family retreats. Benevolent giving.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Buckinghamshire
- Kent
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- Germany
- Ireland
- Philippines
- Spain
Governance
- 19 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ESELLA TORTOSA LOCTUGAN | Trustee | 15 January 2009 |
|
|
||||
ROSARIO SALVADOR LIM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENDA INOCENCIO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.77k | £155.64k | £151.20k | £169.68k | £201.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.69k | £118.27k | £115.73k | £145.18k | £181.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 20 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS: (I) TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ATTACHED TO THIS GOVERNING DOCUMENT; AND (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
155A
King's Road
Chelsea
London
SW3 5TX
- Phone:
- 01296586358
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window