SPECIAL KIDS IN THE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides information, support and contact between families of children and young people with special needs in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 July 2005: Standard registration
- SPECIAL KIDS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashleigh Brastock | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Laurence Hearne | Trustee | 18 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tandy Hearne | Trustee | 18 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Courtney Cookson | Trustee | 16 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
SANDY BRAITHWAITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.71k | £4.55k | £974 | £1.70k | £501 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.86k | £4.47k | £4.33k | £4.98k | £5.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 296 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 November 2022 | 558 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 November 2022 | 558 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/06/2007 AS AMENDED ON 11/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE DISABLED OR HAVE SPECIAL NEEDS, THEIR PARENTS OR CARERS (THE BENEFICIARIES) BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT, RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND WHERE DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN OBTAINING SPECIALISED EQUIPMENT TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
198 Parsonage Lane
ENFIELD
EN1 3UQ
- Phone:
- 02083644045
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window