THE PAVEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The production & distribution of a free monthly news magazine and online resources for the homeless with advice columns & an up-to-date list of services available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Val Stevenson | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christina Lawford | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
William Butler | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR STEPHEN CHAN | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Clare Argent | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.48k | £43.04k | £43.04k | £32.61k | £30.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.43k | £37.49k | £37.49k | £26.25k | £29.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/01/2005 AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 26/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP, AND DISTRESS AMONG HOMELESS PERSONS IN OUR DISTRIBUTION AREA, BY PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND GUIDANCE ON ACCESSING DAY/NIGHT SHELTERS VOLUNTARY BODIES PROVIDING FOOD TO THE HOMELESS, HEALTH ISSUES AND GENERAL ADVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PAVEMENT
38 Allcroft Road
London
NW5 4NE
- Phone:
- 02074855002
- Email:
- trustees@thepavement.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window