MARITIME INDUSTRY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enriching human knowledge and understanding of the vital roles of maritime industries and commercial shipping in the economic, social, political and cultural life of the global environment. And to improve the image of shipping, to heighten awareness of international shipping and to attract young people both to the seafaring professions and to careers onshore.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 July 2005: Standard registration
- 28 April 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 28 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1002462 THE NAUTICAL INSTITUTE
- MIF (Working name)
- THE FOUNDATION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.28k | £1.44k | £3.67k | £5.57k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.22k | £4.73k | £7.07k | £1.62k | £57.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 DECEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS IN THE HISTORY OF SHIPPING AND SEABORNE TRADE BY THE COLLECTION, COLLATION AND DISSEMINATION OF RELEVANT INFORMATION AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO STUDENTS OR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS UNDERTAKING RELATED RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UK AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window