Accounts and annual returns HORN AFRICAN HUMANITARIAN ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1110387
Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 May 2023 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required