Financial history BERACHAH-FAITH MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1110086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.56k £12.75k £23.09k £24.93k £24.76k
Total expenditure £18.97k £12.00k £21.75k £27.62k £35.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A