MID BEDFORDSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities for the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £122,853 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 13 June 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Edward Paul McGowan | Chair | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Hugh Steer | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Wiltshire | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLIFFORD MARK CARTER | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROGER HENRY SANBROOK OBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK ANDREW SMITH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.82k | £199.31k | £219.60k | £227.97k | £129.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.57k | £195.00k | £202.03k | £192.07k | £188.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £160.24k | £184.95k | £205.57k | £192.09k | £122.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN MID BEDFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
MID BEDFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
MID BEDFORDSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE
CENTURY HOUSE
MARKET SQUARE
BIGGLESWADE
BEDS
SG18 8UU
- Phone:
- 01525402742
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window