Financial history THE KING'S CHURCH MID-SUSSEX

Charity number: 1110018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £901.81k £859.34k £830.52k £970.20k £1.08m
Total expenditure £898.47k £774.69k £864.24k £1.01m £1.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £38.94k £2.12k £8.50k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £695.48k £777.06k £626.06k £699.48k £772.83k
Income - Other trading activities £168.22k £48.32k £159.43k £224.08k £256.79k
Income - Charitable activities £38.05k £33.95k £41.01k £46.10k £46.85k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £59 £10 £0 £541 £1.89k
Income - Other £0 £0 £4.02k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £108.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £792.77k £733.13k £761.03k £867.88k £952.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds £105.70k £41.56k £103.22k £145.17k £181.38k
Expenditure - Governance £3.80k £3.80k £3.80k £4.45k £5.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £58.85k £96.42k £78.75k £104.46k £65.87k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0