Financial history THE ORTHOPAEDICS CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1110248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £39.82k £33.95k £42.56k £38.35k £53.03k
Total expenditure £63.22k £165.34k £34.20k £37.08k £92.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A