IPSWICH AND COASTAL DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 07 September 2005: Standard registration
- 17 December 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ICDVF (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 30 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 06 June 2007 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS THE PREVENTION OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND THE RELIEF AND SUPPORT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE IN DANGER OF SUFFERING ABUSE AND THOSE WHO PERPETRATE ABUSE IN IPSWICH BOROUGH AND SUFFOLK COASTAL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ENABLING AGENCIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO PROVIDE A CO-ORDINATED AND COLLABORATIVE APPROACH; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY AGENCIES AND THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN ALL ASPECTS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, ITS CAUSES AND PREVENTION.
Area of benefit
IPSWICH BOROUGH AND SUFFOLK COASTAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window