BROMLEY BY BOW BANGLADESHI FORUM AND MUSLIM CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the islamic religion education to muslim community and Bengali language education to Bangladishi community. The advancement of the education of general public in many fields of Islamic faith and culture, and others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 14 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ILAS MOHAMMED | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|||||
FARUK MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL HAMID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KHALES UDDIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WAKIBUR RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.12k | £42.30k | £65.61k | £150.59k | £196.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.86k | £55.96k | £50.01k | £61.39k | £137.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2024 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 6 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED ON 11 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TRUE RELIGIOUS GUIDELINES FROM THE HOLY QURAN AND HADITH (SAYING OF PROPHET PEACE BE UPON HIM). 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE BENGALI AND MUSLIM CHILDREN OF THE AREA IN THE MANY FACTS OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND CULTURE AND IN THE BENGALI LANGUAGE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROMLEY BY BOW BANGLADESHI FORUM
AND MUSLIM CULTURAL CENTRE
GROUND FLOOR
DEVON TENANTS HALL
POWIS ROAD
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02089813528
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window