Accounts and annual returns SHARING VOICES (BRADFORD)

Charity number: 1112686
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 April 2025 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 April 2025 87 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 April 2025 433 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 April 2025 433 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 March 2023 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 March 2023 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 March 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 March 2021 37 days late Download Open in new window