CLIFF TOP KENNELS RE-HOMING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cliff Top Kennels Rehoming Centre is dedicated to finding homes for unwanted,abandoned and stray dogs in the Scarborough area. At Cliff Top Kennels Rehoming Centre a healthy dog is never put to sleep. We look after them and show them the care and attention they deserve until we can find a new suitable and loving home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL PENNOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACKIE MAGSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.42k | £10.44k | £3.42k | £12.82k | £4.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.71k | £14.34k | £4.07k | £10.16k | £11.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG DOGS WHICH HAVE NEED OF THIS REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT OR NEGLECT OR HOMELESSNESS IN ANY WAYS WHICH ARE DEEMED CHARITABLE IN LAW. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE WAYS IN WHICH TO ACHIEVE THE ABOVE AND IN OTHER MATTERS OF GENERAL DOG WELFARE IN THE SCARBOROUGH DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cliff Top Kennels
Rocks Lane
Burniston
SCARBOROUGH
North Yorkshire
YO13 0HX
- Phone:
- 01723870456
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window