PARISH NURSING MINISTRIES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education of qualified registered nurses so that they can work with their church to provide health care (physical, mental and spiritual), advice and advocacy to their local community. Ongoing support for in post nurses and their appointing churches. Continuing education in the form of training days and an annual symposium.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Paul Fouch | Chair | 26 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Fr Damian Feeney | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Brown | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anne MacFarlane | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glen Michael Johnson | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joycelyn Fletcher | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Amanda Christine Allchorn | Trustee | 27 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Page Edwards | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.51k | £92.93k | £93.65k | £156.08k | £212.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.17k | £106.08k | £124.12k | £131.72k | £179.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MAY 2005 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2005, 10 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 9 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
A) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG COMMUNITIES THROUGHOUT THE UK BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN FUNDING THE COSTS AND TRAINING OF PARISH NURSES AND BY ASSISTING IN THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF SAID PARISH NURSES. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UK BY THE PROMOTION OF PARISH NURSING AND ASSISTING IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND TRAINING OF PARISH NURSE INITIATIVES. C) TO SUPPORT SPECIFIC OVERSEAS PARISH NURSING INITIATIVES
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 North Street
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 2RA
- Phone:
- 01733233546
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window