AIM HIGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRANTS AND DONATIONS IN LINE WITH TRUST DEED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bury
Governance
- 09 December 2005: Standard registration
- TSF (Working name)
- THE MANCHESTER SWALLOW FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Akiva Heilpern | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JACOB SRULI SILBER | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHAIM SILBER | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.98k | £184.92k | £40.54k | £29.62k | £29.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.69k | £6.26k | £22.19k | £21.80k | £31.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 DEC 2004 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2005 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
1) RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST ORTHODOX JEWS 2) ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION 3) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ACCORDING TO THE TENETS OF ORTHODOX JUDAISM 4) THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 WELLINGTON STREET WEST
SALFORD
M7 2FH
- Phone:
- 01617956195
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window