Trustees SOUTH ASIAN SOCIETY (SAAS)
Charity number: 1110925

Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Girish Venkatarayappa | Chair | 17 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vikram Sharma | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amit Dhulkotia | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Smita Tripathi | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abhijit Ghatge | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Achin Sobti | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arunima Kisku | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mahrukh Mirza | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Prof Arunangsu Chatterjee | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rajaraman Srinivasan | Trustee | 17 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Prof Awadhesh Nandan Jha | Trustee | 01 June 2005 |
|
|
||||
Dr BHARAT RAJ SHRESTHA | Trustee | 12 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
JAYANTI BHAGWANJI | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.