CUDDALORE HEALTH AND AGRICULTURE TRUST, INDIA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion and development of sustainable organic agriculture and forestry in the Cuddalore and adjoining Perambalur districts of Tamil Nadu state in South India mainly through a model farm demonstrating traditional and newly researched techniques. Outreach village work is undertaken. Regular integrated medical clinics are maintained and outreach visits conducted for ongoing health support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- India
Governance
- 10 October 2005: Standard registration
- 14 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WELLBEING TRUST INDIA (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2013 | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.60k | £5.35k | £3.79k | £6.45k | £935 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.06k | £14.09k | £3.53k | £4.52k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 25 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 11 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | 14 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 10 APRIL 2006.
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUSTAINABLE ORGANIC AGRICULTURE IN THE CUDDALORE DISTRICT OF TAMIL NADU, SOUTH EAST INDIA. 2. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN THE CUDDALORE DISTRICT OF TAMIL NADU, SOUTH EAST INDIA PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF INTEGRATED HEALTHCARE. 3. TO ESTABLISH LINKS, INITIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITH TAMIL GROUPS IN THE U.K. SO THAT THEY CAN ASSIST IN INCREASING RECOGNITION OF THE CHARITY AND MAXIMISE FUNDRAISING OPPORTUNITIES. ALSO THAT THEY, AND PEOPLE IN THE CUDDALORE AREA, MAY SHARE AND BENEFIT FROM THE EXCHANGE OF KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERIENCE IN THE AREAS OF ORGANIC AGRICULTURE AND INTEGRATED HEALTHCARE.
Area of benefit
CUDDALORE DISTRICT OF TAMIL NADU, SOUTH EAST INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window