Financial history THE ROOPRAI SPINAL TRUST

Charity number: 1111092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £167.55k £66.93k £64.72k £115.67k £137.60k
Total expenditure £142.78k £80.34k £60.71k £114.36k £159.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A