THE ROOPRAI SPINAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ROOPRAI SPINAL TRUST WAS ESTABLISHED TO HELP VICTIMS OF SERIOUS SPINAL INJURY/PARALYSIS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 August 2005: Standard registration
- RST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON HART | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN LEE WACKETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL GEORGE COOK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.55k | £66.93k | £64.72k | £115.67k | £137.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.78k | £80.34k | £60.71k | £114.36k | £159.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
I) TO PROVIDE HELP AND SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS AFFECTED BY SPINAL CORD INJURY. II) TO PROVIDE HELP AND SUPPORT TO FAMILY MEMBERS OF INDIVIDUALS AFFECTED BY SPINAL CORD INJURY. III) AT THE TRUSTEES’ DISCRETION, TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS WITH SPINAL CORD INJURY ACCESS TO SPECIALIST PHYSIOTHERAPY. IV) AT THE TRUSTEES’ DISCRETION, TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO OTHER RECOGNISED CHARITIES WHO STRIVE TO REVERSE PARALYSIS CAUSED BY SPINAL CORD INJURY.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROOPRAI SPINAL TRUST
MANUFACTORY HOUSE
BELL LANE
HERTFORD
SG14 1BP
- Phone:
- 01438226365
- Email:
- info@rstrust.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window