CENTRAL AFRICA PROJECT FOR HIV & AIDS AWARENESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HEALTH PROMOTION SUPPORT AND ADVICE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 June 2005: Standard registration
- CAPHAA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEATRICE EMMANUELLE HAPI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Diampova Karl | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
TCHONANG GERMAINE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMBA YIKA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.95k | £200 | £100 | £200 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.90k | £190 | £100 | £200 | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, POVERTY OR DISTRESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF THOSE AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS, AND THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT BOTH TO SUFFERERS AND TO THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS. (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITH REGARDS TO UNWANTED PREGNANCY, DRUGS AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE AND SEXUAL HEALTH ISSUES, INCLUDING HIV/AIDS AND THE APPARENTLY RELATED DISEASES AND CONDITIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Bramblewood Close
Carshalton
SM5 1PQ
- Phone:
- 07985633937
- Email:
- beatricehapi@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window