Financial history MIND IN BEXLEY AND EAST KENT LTD

Charity number: 1110130
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.73m £4.80m £5.11m £4.74m £6.34m
Total expenditure £3.35m £3.81m £3.83m £4.10m £5.07m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.49m N/A £5.07m N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £58.97k £43.63k £36.91k £32.17k £39.89k
Income - Other trading activities £179.60k £30.13k £4.30k £7.99k £236.45k
Income - Charitable activities £3.49m £4.73m £5.07m £4.70m £6.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.34k £1.10k £642 £6.30k £39.33k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.26m £3.76m £3.80m £4.06m £4.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £92.72k £40.47k £28.92k £38.77k £158.11k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £13.90k £71.69k £57.91k £62.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0