POOL OF LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and protection of good health among survivors of breast cancer within the Cumbria, Lancashire, Merseyside, Greater Manchester and Cheshire areas by the provision of facilities for exercise, in particular dragon boat racing. Intended to reduce the risk of lymphoedema for those otherwise at risk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 07 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sonia Tracy Roberts | Chair | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Maria Tennant | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
June Rice | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.03k | £4.28k | £7.15k | £3.09k | £3.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £6.61k | £4.03k | £6.50k | £12.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 January 2022 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 2005, AS AMENDED 6 OCTOBER 2005 as amended on 07 Jul 2019 as amended on 01 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG SURVIVORS OF BREAST CANCER WITHIN THE CUMBRIA, LANCASHIRE, MERSEYSIDE, GREATER MANCHESTER AND CHESHIRE AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EXERCISE, IN PARTICULAR DRAGONBOAT RACING. INTENDED TO REDUCE THE RISK OF LYMPHADEMA FOR THOSE OTHERWISE AT RISK.
Area of benefit
CUMBRIA, LANCASHIRE, MERSEYSIDE, GREATER MANCHESTER AND CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Brookland Road
BIRKENHEAD
Merseyside
CH41 2SP
- Phone:
- 07988788812
- Email:
- enquiries@pooloflife.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window