SHROPSHIRE WOMEN'S AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Shropshire
Governance
- 24 August 2005: Standard registration
- 24 July 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 21 March 2007 | 49 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED 25 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SHROPSHIRE SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS THE PREVENTION OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AND THE RELIEF AND SUPPORT OF WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN WHO ARE IN DANGER OF SUFFERING OR HAVE SUFFERED FROM SUCH ABUSE (INCLUDING PHYSICAL, MENTAL, SEXUAL AND OR EMOTIONAL DISTRESS) BY THE PROVISION OF REFUGE SPACES, ADVOCACY, SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES AND; B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF ALL FORMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AGAINST WOMEN AND THE PREVENTION THEREOF.
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window