CARERS GLOUCESTERSHIRE

Charity Number: 1110529
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is established to provide relief for persons who are ill, disabled or elderly, by the provision of support and information to Carers and former Carers. In short, we are working to enhance the lives of Carers. We have identified the following Key Objectives - Identifying Carers. - Providing a range in response to their needs, - Giving Carers a Voice

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2019

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 July 2005: Standard registration
  • 19 November 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 19 November 2020: Funds transferred to 900239 COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £2.12m £2.23m £2.00m £1.83m £1.86m
Total expenditure £2.07m £2.37m £1.99m £1.62m £1.98m
Income from government contracts £1.40m £1.95m £1.75m £1.65m £1.70m
Income from government grants £274.49k £17.43k £19.83k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £215.80k £29.38k £21.03k £38.58k £21.90k
Income - Other trading activities £62.58k £145.57k £78.18k £26.30k £8.62k
Income - Charitable activities £1.83m £2.04m £1.88m £1.75m £1.82m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.66k £12.44k £11.68k £11.30k £10.85k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.99m £2.19m £1.93m £1.59m £1.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £173.89k £60.72k £35.72k £25.46k
Expenditure - Governance £10.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £232.93k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 30/06/2019
Own use assets £9.50k £11.95k £4.07k £1.36k £0
Long-term investments £1 £0 £1 £0 £0
Other assets £829.65k £606.64k £657.52k £668.47k £486.50k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £241.86k £229.91k £262.27k £77.60k £11.99k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 June 2020 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 06 June 2020 37 days late
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On Time