CHISWICK HORTICULTURAL AND ALLOTMENTS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion and furtherance of the art, science and practice of horticulture. Make gardening accessible to people with learning disabilities, reduce economic barriers by selling gardening supplies, provide information on growing food organically, care for wildlife and the environment, organise gardening shows, arrange educational and social fundraising activities, regenerate local allotments
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
Governance
- 21 June 2005: Standard registration
- CHAS (Working name)
- CHISWICK HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Daniel Rabin | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Parsley | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judy Parsley | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cripps | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BURTON | Trustee | 06 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JAMES GILL | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MICHAEL FLINDERS | Trustee | 21 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.55k | £28.37k | £28.88k | £25.53k | £24.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.95k | £33.05k | £29.86k | £18.63k | £22.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | £2.50k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2005, AS AMENDED ON 25 AUGUST 2005 as amended on 17 May 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE ART, SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF HORTICULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 ST. MARYS GROVE
LONDON
W4 3LW
- Phone:
- 07903 412284
- Email:
- secretary@growchiswick.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window