INTERNATIONAL FINANCE FACILITY FOR IMMUNISATION COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IFFIm's primary purpose is to function as a financing vehicle in order to support the GAVI Alliance in accelerating the provision of charitable funds for vaccination and health systems strengthening projects in developing countries. IFFIm is funded by grants pledged by U.K. and international governments. IFFIm is unable to accept donations from members of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£153,259,961
Donations and legacies | £114.96m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £38.30m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£344,597,627
Raising funds | £38.78m | |
Charitable activities | £305.82m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £38.78m | |
Charitable expenditure | £305.82m |
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Switzerland
Governance
- 18 July 2006: Standard registration
- IFFIM CO (Working name)
- INTERNATIONAL FINANCE FACILITY FOR IMMUNISATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Lay | Chair | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid van Wees | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hassatou Diop N'Sele | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Monique Barbut | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Pulay | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helge Weiner-Trapness | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bertrand de Mazieres | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Doris Aida D Lourdes Herrera Pol | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.47m | £1.06bn | £523.66m | £443.01m | £153.26m | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.06m | £171.74m | £1.06bn | £413.77m | £344.60m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £477.92m | N/A | £368.46m | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £47.15m | £1.06bn | £523.17m | £433.93m | £114.96m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £18.32m | £3.51m | £484.41k | £9.07m | £38.30m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £170.70m | £166.41m | £1.05bn | £393.98m | £305.82m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £18.36m | £5.33m | £8.91m | £19.78m | £38.78m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.65m | £1.65m | £1.72m | £1.84m | £1.96m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £164.76m | £1.05bn | £392.15m | £303.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.91bn | £2.83bn | £3.11bn | £3.67bn | £2.91bn | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.06bn | £1.15bn | £1.92bn | £2.35bn | £1.77bn |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF THE ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED 26 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND 22 DECEMBER 2008 as amended on 17 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE USE OF THE RESOURCES OF GAVI ORGANISATIONS FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING SERVICES AND FACILITIES WHICH WILL ASSIST GAVI ORGANISATIONS TO RAISE FUNDS. SUCH PROVISION OF SERVICES AND FACILITIES MAY INCLUDE, BUT WILL NOT BE LIMITED TO, THE CHARITY BORROWING MONEY BY ANY MEANS ON THE SECURITY OF COVENANTS OR OTHER AGREEMENTS WHEREBY GOVERNMENTS PROMISE FUNDS TO GAVI ORGANISATIONS FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND, IN CONNECTION WITH SUCH BORROWING, OBTAINING ANY OTHER KIND OF FINANCIAL ACCOMMODATION OR ENTERING INTO ANY HEDGING ARRANGEMENT. IN THIS CLAUSE: I 'CHARITABLE PURPOSES' MEANS THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES; II 'GAVI ORGANISATIONS' MEANS THE GAVI FUND AFFILIATE AND OTHER CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS SUPPORTED BY OR ASSOCIATED WITH THE GLOBAL ALLIANCE FOR VACCINATION AND IMMUNISATION (GAVI). III 'VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS' MEANS INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. NATIONAL OR OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carpenter Court
1 Maple Road
Bramhall
Stockport
Cheshire
England
- Phone:
- 02074562000
- Email:
- paul.doe@linklaters.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window