GLOBAL ALLIANCE FOR LIVESTOCK VETERINARY MEDICINES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GALVmed fosters ground breaking partnerships on a global scale between animal health industry and other organisations. Our aim is to promote the development of accessible and affordable animal vaccines and other animal health products for the poorest farmers in developing countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£9,620,053
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £9.08m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £541.57k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£10,278,111
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £9.92m | |
Other | £355.66k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,887,960 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £355.66k | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.92m |
People

27 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bangladesh
- Benin
- Botswana
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Chad
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- India
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 28 July 2006: Standard registration
- GALV (Working name)
- GLOBAL ALLIANCE FOR LIVESTOCK VACCINES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Philip Thornton | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Cheikh Ly | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Henry Matukho Wamwayi | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fabian Martin Kausche | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alice Hope Banga | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shraman Jha | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Junaidu Maina | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Isabelle Dieuzy-Labaye | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.36m | £16.93m | £13.36m | £13.09m | £9.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.42m | £11.19m | £11.55m | £11.10m | £10.28m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.75m | £2.44m | £1.41m | £1.05m | £1.89m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £12.16m | £16.91m | £13.36m | £11.77m | £9.08m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £199.84k | £13.78k | £5.64k | £362.59k | £541.57k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £958.08k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.42m | £11.19m | £11.55m | £11.10m | £9.92m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £86.28k | £3.76k | £49.07k | £130.54k | £129.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £355.66k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £86.78k | £61.97k | £31.66k | £15.24k | £38.76k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £10.74m | £14.70m | £17.51m | £19.79m | £18.31m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £932.69k | £765.10k | £1.01m | £1.28m | £481.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MARCH 2005 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 JULY 2006 AND 27 OCTOBER 2006 as amended on 12 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH (INCLUDING IMPROVING FOOD SECURITY) AMONGST LIVESTOCK KEEPERS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF AFFORDABLE VACCINES, PHARMACEUTICALS AND DIAGNOSTIC PRODUCTS AND SERVICES AIMED AT IMPROVING THE HEALTH OF THEIR LIVESTOCK; AND 2 TO PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES TO ACHIEVE THE ABOVE CHARITABLE PURPOSES THROUGH THE IDENTIFICATION, MANAGEMENT, FUNDING AND CO-ORDINATION OF: A) RESEARCH INTO LIVESTOCK VACCINES, PHARMACEUTICALS AND DIAGNOSTIC PRODUCTS AND SERVICES; AND B) THE DEVELOPMENT AND DELIVERY OF THOSE PRODUCTS AND SERVICES AT AFFORDABLE PRICES, BY WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHERS (WHETHER CHARITIES, GOVERNMENT OR PRIVATE BODIES OR INSTITUTIONS). FOOD SECURITY IS DEFINED BY THE UNITED NATIONS' FOOD AND AGRICULTURE ORGANISATION AS EXISTING WHEN ALL PEOPLE AT ALL TIMES, HAVE PHYSICAL AND ECONOMIC ACCESS TO SUFFICIENT, SAFE AND NUTRITIOUS FOOD TO MEET THEIR DIETARY NEEDS AND FOOD PREFERENCES FOR AN ACTIVE AND HEALTHY LIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GALVMED
DOHERTY BUILDING
PENTLANDS SCIENCE PARK
BUSH LOAN
EDINBURGH
SCOTLAND
- Phone:
- 01314456264
- Email:
- info@galvmed.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window