DIABETES RESEARCH INSTITUTE FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED

Charity Number: 1110229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Created for one reason - to cure diabetes.This is our singular focus until that goal is reached.Our objective is to discover a biological cure for diabetes, to restore natural insulin production and normalize blood sugar levels without imposing other risks.To this end we are funding the development of a DRI BioHub, a bioengineered mini organ that mimics the native pancreas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £84

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 June 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sean Kramer Trustee 17 July 2020
None on record
HAROLD DORAN Trustee 25 October 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.03k £390 £1.13k £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.80k £11.08k £11.21k £9.95k £84
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 December 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
200 SOUTH PARK ROAD
SUITE 100 HOLLYWOOD
FLORIDA 33021
USA
Phone:
+1 (954) 964 4040
Email:
info@drif.org