Accounts and annual returns HOLSWORTHY AMATEUR THEATRICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1110237
Charity reporting is overdue by 367 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 February 2025 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 367 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window