HOLSWORTHY AMATEUR THEATRICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur theatrical company which owns its own theatre. Produces annual pantomime, plays and musical shows. Hires out theatre for other theatrical events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 28 June 2005: Standard registration
- HATS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN HILARY COLUILL PAINTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bethany michelle Lock | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Anthony Brooking | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Paul Clever | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Duckworth | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey joy Wosnitizka | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Leach | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amy Clarke | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Whitehead | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN EARLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNETTE JACQUELINE DENNIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP RICE BARFETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.66k | £42.67k | £20.49k | £13.23k | £33.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.27k | £35.68k | £45.26k | £20.49k | £29.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.43k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 February 2025 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 368 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED ON 03 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLSWORTHY THEATRE
BODMIN STREET
HOLSWORTHY
DEVON
EX22 6BH
- Phone:
- 01409253826
- Email:
- nettjdennis@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window