Trustees HOLSWORTHY AMATEUR THEATRICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1110237

Charity reporting is overdue by 367 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN HILARY COLUILL PAINTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bethany michelle Lock | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Anthony Brooking | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Paul Clever | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Duckworth | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey joy Wosnitizka | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Leach | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amy Clarke | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Whitehead | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN EARLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNETTE JACQUELINE DENNIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP RICE BARFETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.