Financial history NEW WORLD MISSION ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1112203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £672.64k £448.81k £597.01k £619.84k £691.30k
Total expenditure £620.51k £456.78k £594.25k £762.22k £756.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £7.22k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £613.83k N/A £553.89k £609.96k £687.10k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £57.80k N/A £616 £9.85k £3.31k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.01k N/A £17 £22 £893
Income - Other £0 N/A £42.49k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £481.43k N/A £589.33k £757.63k £750.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds £99.32k N/A £4.92k £4.59k £5.37k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £42.04k £97.78k £36.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £39.76k N/A £0 £0 £0