LLANDUDNO COMMUNITY RADIO LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LLANDUDNO COMMUNITY RADIO LTD (TUDNO FM) IS A COMMUNITY RADIO OPERATING IN LLANDUDNO FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF LLANDUDNO AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. THE STATION HAS A 5 YEAR BROADCASTING LICENCE FROM OFCOM AND BROADCASTS ON 107.8 FM
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Conwy
Governance
- 04 November 2005: Standard registration
- 16 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- LLANDUDNO COMMUNITY RADIO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.28k | £10.96k | £3.26k | £0 | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.89k | £12.10k | £1.70k | £0 | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 22 December 2020 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 1 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LLANDUDNO, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY RADIO AS A RECREATIONAL FACILITY FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH A FACILITY BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR VOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN RADIO BROADCASTING AND MEDIA SKILLS TECHNIQUES AND WORK; TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE HEALTH IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION TO MEN AND WOMEN ON HEALTH AND HEALTH RELATED MATTERS; AND TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING GOOD RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE OF DIFFERING RACIAL CULTURAL OR ETHNIC BACKGROUNDS AND BY PROVIDING INFORMATION TO MEN AND WOMEN WHO MAY HAVE DIFFICULTY IN ENFORCING THEIR RIGHTS BECAUSE OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGINS OR ILLITERACY IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE.
Area of benefit
LLANDUDNO AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window