Financial history ENFIELD LGBT NETWORK

Charity number: 1111437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £58.09k £103.85k £115.87k £110.62k £91.19k
Total expenditure £55.81k £79.56k £104.69k £105.19k £111.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.00k £37.00k £37.00k £37.00k £37.00k