Governing document THE JUDD SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/09/1996 AS AMENDED ON 06/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 18/08/2010 as amended on 20 Oct 2020 as amended on 12 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
The object of the association is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: a) Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school b) Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils
Area of benefit
BIDBOROUGH, SOUTHBOROUGH AND OUTLYING AREAS. EDENBRIDGE, WESTERHAM AND DISTRICT, HILDENBOROUGH AND WEALD, KEMSING AND OTFORD, SEVENOAKS, TONBRIDGE, TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND PEMBURY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.