Trustees THE JUDD SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1110321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sucheta Mundada Trustee 15 October 2024
None on record
Nina Braam Trustee 14 October 2024
WEALD OF KENT GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Received: 110 days late
Aran Louise Dadswell Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
Hien Le Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
Jennifer Wright Trustee 12 September 2022
None on record
Inese Rusina Trustee 22 September 2021
None on record
Abigail West Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
Michaela Law Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
Zoe Anderson Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record