Accounts and annual returns WATER FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1113268
Regulatory alert
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024
Annual return 30 June 2023
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

Annual return 30 June 2022
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

Annual return 30 June 2021
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

Annual return 30 June 2020
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020