Financial history THORNHILL NURSERY

Charity number: 1110278
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £26.17k £36.75k £24.52k £26.55k £39.76k
Total expenditure £21.57k £25.77k £23.62k £27.29k £34.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A