Accounts and annual returns THE CROYDON HIGH SCHOOL SCHOLARSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1112056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 24 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 18 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 19 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 19 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window