Accounts and annual returns CHILDREN OF LATIN AMERICA

Charity number: 1111335
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2018 09 December 2019 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 02 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 09 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required