FOREVER HELP A CHILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aiding children in need through medical supplies, sponsorship, educational means, limbs etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 28 September 2005: Standard registration
- FOREVER (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASHA CHADHA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRINA CHADHA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BALBIR KAUR MANDIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £840 | £600 | £600 | £400 | £410 | |
|
Total expenditure | £840 | £600 | £600 | £400 | £410 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 JANUARY 2004, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2005,
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISIONS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THE PURCHASE OF SPECIALIST MEDICAL EQUIPMENT, THE PROVISION OF HOSPITALS IN POOR RURAL AREAS OF THE WORLD AND THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ORPHANAGES AND CARE CENTRES FOR CHILDREN. 2. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FREE MEDICAL CAMPS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
POOR RURAL AREAS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
564 Denby Dale Road
Calder Grove
WAKEFIELD
WF4 3DH
- Phone:
- 01924274418
- Email:
- arunchadha1953@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window