SANDHURST & DISTRICT "CORPS OF DRUMS"

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer children and young people an opportunity to take part in a youth marching band. We teach all the basics that are needed to take part. Our main aim is to build the confidence of children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
Total income includes £7,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Reading
- Slough
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 05 July 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK SAUNDERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
William Arther McNeill | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOSHUA STUART THORNE | Trustee | 11 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CAVE | Trustee | 05 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY JANE SAUNDERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.59k | £8.13k | £2.12k | £11.04k | £18.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.44k | £24.16k | £2.34k | £13.56k | £13.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 42 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 42 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF MEMBERS AND LEADERS OF THE SANDHURST & DISTRICT 'CORPS OF DRUMS' YOUTH MARCHING BAND AND THE PROMOTION OF MENTAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO 25 YEARS OF AGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS, COMPETITIONS, CONCERTS OF MUSIC AND DANCE AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 GIBBONS CLOSE
SANDHURST
GU47 9BB
- Phone:
- 07751754981
- Email:
- sparkysaunders@supanet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window