FOREVER ANGELS UK LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting a Baby Home in Tanzania that provides interim care to orphaned, abandoned and HIV positive infants, providing them with love, security, medical care, nourishment and quality attention in a family environment, until a permanent family can be found for them. In addition, working closely with their families empowering them to care for their children in their home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Tanzania
Governance
- 31 October 2005: Standard registration
- 29 September 2023: Funds received from 1111220 KIDS AID TANZANIA
- FOREVER ANGELS (Working name)
- FOREVER PROJECTS (Working name)
- FOREVER ANGELS UK (Previous name)
- FOREVER PROJECTS TANZANIA LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANE MITCHELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kate Elizabeth Daykin | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shauneen Kelly | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirstin Rebecca Datta | Trustee | 07 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Madden | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH GERALDINE ANN CASSIDY | Trustee |
|
||||||
Peter David Mitchell | Trustee |
|
||||||
VALERIE LITHGOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £333.60k | £244.13k | £247.45k | £314.31k | £247.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £285.32k | £268.36k | £263.49k | £297.63k | £239.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 OCT 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONGST ORPHANED, ABANDONED AND UNWANTED CHILDREN IN TANZANIA, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF A HOME.
Area of benefit
TANZANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
107 Weston Lane
Basford
CREWE
CW2 5NJ
- Phone:
- 01270560452
- Email:
- directors@foreverangels.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window