BROUGHTON MILLS READING ROOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes, Education/Training, Sport/recreation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER CHARLES MUNDAY | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN JOHN ACOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD WILLIAM JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH EASTHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.54k | £10.91k | £771 | £1.28k | £1.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.13k | £705 | £3.31k | £1.63k | £994 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2024 | 277 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 22ND MARCH 1927
Charitable objects
A. AS A READING AND RECREATION ROOM FOR THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INTELLECTUAL AND MORAL IMPROVEMENT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PRESCRIBED AREA (FOR FURTHER DETAILS OF THE PRESCRIBED AREA PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 2A OF THE CONVEYANCE) B. FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OR PURPOSE WHICH THE TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BEING MAY THINK FIT AND PROPER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PRESCRIBED AREA AND FOR THAT PURPOSE PORTIONS OF THE PREMISES SHALL BE USED AS READING ROOM SMOKING AND GAMES ROOM AND OTHER RECREATION AS SHALL BE APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2B OF THE CONVEYANCE)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH LICKLE HOUSE
BROUGHTON-IN-FURNESS
LA20 6AS
- Phone:
- 01229716647
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window