Financial history CAPTAIN PAUL WATSON FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1110501
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £389.09k £339.99k £773.01k £1.57m £586.71k
Total expenditure £330.54k £324.91k £308.55k £839.51k £1.31m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £581.29k £1.22m £486.66k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £63.72k £351.23k £53.00k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £15.76k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £128.00k £0 £53.00k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £1.86k £47.05k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £10.24k £9.50k £3.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £308.45k £622.04k £1.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £100 £214.47k £273
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £7.71k £30.89k £79.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £432 £15.33k £152.72k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £3.00k £0