THE UK MDS FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity holds meetings to educate health care professionals, or patients and their carers, about the nature of and latest developments in MDS. It offers grants for research into MDS or sponsors travel for trainees or others wishing to attend national or international meetings .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 September 2005: Standard registration
- 12 January 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 12 January 2024: Funds transferred to 1005735 THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR HAEMATOLOGY
- THE UKMDS FORUM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.10k | £10.30k | £0 | £21.00k | £2.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.03k | £27.38k | £480 | £14.24k | £20.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR IN THE TREATMENT OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM MYELODYSPLASTIC SYNDROME (MDS) AND RELATED DISORDERS, THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND CONDUCT OF RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF ALL USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MDS AND RELATED DISORDERS, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) THE DEVELOPMENT AND PROVISION OF POLICY GUIDELINES FOR THEIR TREATMENT; AND B) PROMOTING AN UNDERSTANDING OF THE ISSUES RELATING TO MDS AND RELATED DISORDERS BY ENCOURAGING COMMUNICATION AND THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION BETWEEN RESEARCH GROUPS AND HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window