CAMBRIDGE YOUTH MUSIC

Charity Number: 1111095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting the musical education of young people in and around Cambridge through the provision of learning and performing opportunities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £556
Total expenditure: £1,436

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 August 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EDNA HELEN MURPHY Chair
CAMBRIDGE PHILHARMONIC
Received: On time
ALISON JUDY COUNSELL Trustee
None on record
VIRGINIA GRACE CLARE GILMOUR Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.43k £1.47k £3.40k £801 £556
Total expenditure £3.36k £798 £2.72k £673 £1.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Chapel Close
Empingham
Oakham
LE15 8BX
Phone:
01780461196