Accounts and annual returns CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST GOD'S LOVE IS ETERNAL PARISH

Charity number: 1111046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 06 May 2025 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 26 July 2024 300 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 06 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required